Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Barris Kyvsgaard | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | direktion |
Jens Christian Langhoff | 23.03.1960 | 20.09.1993 | direktion |
Knud-Aage Reedtz Krahn | 23.03.1960 | 09.02.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Gede | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Knud-Erik Borup | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Niels Kaj Strøyberg | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Benne Johansen | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kjærsgaard | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Matthias Max Schon | 23.03.1960 | 27.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Brockstedt-Rasmussen | 23.03.1960 | 21.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Bodholt Jensen | 23.03.1960 | 21.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Niels Skovgaard | 23.03.1960 | 20.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Langhoff | 23.03.1960 | 20.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Dieter Heinz Malten | 23.03.1960 | 20.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Paul Rasmussen | 23.03.1960 | 13.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Knud-Aage Reedtz Krahn | 23.03.1960 | 09.02.1989 | bestyrelse |