Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lindegaard Kjær | 16.03.2020 | 31.08.2021 | adm. dir |
Jakob Niemann Spang Hansen | 05.02.2020 | 16.03.2020 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lindegaard Kjær | 09.02.2020 | 23.02.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Christoffer Vilhelm Gottlieb | 05.02.2020 | 23.02.2020 | formand |