Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Line Brønd Kracht | 01.03.2021 | 08.02.2023 | adm. dir |
Line Brønd Kracht | 02.02.2021 | 04.02.2021 | adm. dir |
Dan Martin Witzell | 08.01.2020 | 02.02.2021 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Line Brønd Kracht | 01.03.2021 | 08.02.2023 | formand |
Line Brønd Kracht | 02.02.2021 | 04.02.2021 | formand |
Dan Martin Witzell | 08.01.2020 | 08.01.2020 | formand |