Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sara Ingrid Cecilia Edlund | 22.04.2022 | 17.04.2023 | adm. dir |
Johan Mikael Werner | 15.10.2021 | 22.04.2022 | adm. dir |
Jan Urban Jernbeck | 01.07.2020 | 12.08.2021 | direktør |
Katarina Forssten | 10.09.2019 | 01.07.2020 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Urban Jernbeck | 18.03.2020 | 01.07.2020 | formand |
Bjarne Eik Schultz-Andersen | 10.09.2019 | 18.03.2020 | formand |