Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Olsen | 28.05.2003 | 17.05.2013 | direktion |
Michael Cani Andersen | 05.12.1984 | 28.05.2003 | direktion |
Erling Anton Pedersen | 05.12.1984 | 15.11.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Cani Andersen | 05.12.1984 | 28.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Maj Lis Schønberg | 05.12.1984 | 28.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Anna Margrethe Pedersen | 05.12.1984 | 15.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
Erling Anton Pedersen | 05.12.1984 | 15.11.1990 | bestyrelse |
John Koppel | 05.12.1984 | 05.10.1987 | bestyrelse |