Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kasper Karmisholt Grosen | 10.12.2020 | 30.08.2021 | adm. dir |
Ioan Adam | 10.08.2020 | 10.12.2020 | adm. dir |
Hacer Topal | 21.10.2019 | 10.08.2020 | adm. dir |
Isa Topal | 26.08.2019 | 21.10.2019 | adm. dir |
Esref Savuran | 14.05.2019 | 26.08.2019 | adm. dir |