Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Christensen | 16.02.2022 | 30.09.2022 | adm. dir |
Karoline Dengsø Toft-Petersen | 18.10.2021 | 16.02.2022 | adm. dir |
Thomas Christensen | 18.10.2021 | 15.02.2022 | direktør |
Henning Christensen | 08.03.2019 | 18.10.2021 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Christensen | 03.08.2019 | 18.10.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Christensen | 08.03.2019 | 18.10.2021 | formand |