Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sirajulhaque Abdullah Patel | 05.12.2018 | 25.08.2019 | direktør |
Sirajulhaque Abdullah Patel | 12.01.2018 | 24.11.2018 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sirajulhaque Abdullah Patel | 05.12.2018 | 25.08.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Latifbhai Ismail Patel | 05.12.2018 | 25.08.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Altaf Ibrahim Ismail Patel | 05.12.2018 | 25.08.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Sirajulhaque Abdullah Patel | 12.01.2018 | 24.11.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Latifbhai Ismail Patel | 12.01.2018 | 24.11.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Altaf Ibrahim Ismail Patel | 12.01.2018 | 24.11.2018 | formand |