Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Herlman | 01.05.2020 | 16.11.2021 | adm. dir |
Thomas Augustesen | 31.07.2017 | 01.05.2020 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Rosenkrantz Jensen | 26.02.2019 | 16.11.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Augustesen | 31.07.2017 | 16.11.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Steen Haack | 31.07.2017 | 16.11.2021 | formand |
Peter Enoch | 31.07.2017 | 26.02.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |