Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Polmann Dyreby | 07.05.2020 | 12.10.2022 | adm. dir |
Marc Fessel | 28.09.2017 | 07.05.2020 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marc Fessel | 07.05.2020 | 24.11.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Polmann Dyreby | 07.05.2020 | 24.11.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jacob Moreno | 07.05.2020 | 24.11.2022 | formand |