Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ingolf Jacob Angel | 01.02.2019 | 10.07.2019 | adm. dir |
Nicki Lundgren Kaas Petersen | 01.02.2019 | 04.04.2019 | direktør |
Nicki Lundgren Kaas Petersen | 22.11.2018 | 31.01.2019 | adm. dir |
Sadar Mansurbeg | 25.04.2017 | 22.11.2018 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ingolf Jacob Angel | 01.02.2019 | 10.07.2019 | formand |