Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgitte Krogsgaard Danø | 02.04.1975 | 17.01.2017 | direktion |
Kai Frede Pries Nielsen | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bodil Iuel | 28.05.1998 | 04.10.2010 | suppleant |
Birgitte Krogsgaard Danø | 02.04.1975 | 04.10.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steen Skov Storgaard | 02.04.1975 | 04.10.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Thulstrup | 02.04.1975 | 04.10.2010 | suppleant |
Steen Bechgaard Danø | 02.04.1975 | 01.01.1998 | suppleant |
Jens Christian Houborg | 02.04.1975 | 13.07.1994 | suppleant |
Steen Bechgaard Danø | 02.04.1975 | 13.07.1994 | formand |
Kirsten Dorrit Lousen | 02.04.1975 | 17.07.1992 | suppleant |
Christian Bødker | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Birger Kurt Yngve Lorentz Melander | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Povl Erik Hansen | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Houborg | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Jørgensen | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | suppleant |
Grete Kristiansen | 02.04.1975 | 21.05.1991 | suppleant |
Ejnar Christensen | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Bernt Philip Holm | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Kai Frede Pries Nielsen | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Hans Bødker | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | suppleant |
Helge Rubæk Hansen | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | suppleant |
Axel Jørgensen | 02.04.1975 | 14.09.1988 | formand |