Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jewan Ahmad Zemji Zebou | 01.08.2020 | 25.08.2021 | direktør |
Mostafa Abdelrazak Mosa | 01.10.2019 | 01.08.2020 | direktør |
Rahim Bas | 01.06.2019 | 01.10.2019 | direktør |
Bilal Biyik | 21.02.2018 | 01.06.2019 | direktør |
Tarkan Nart | 23.03.2017 | 21.02.2018 | adm. dir |