Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Werner Schmidt | 12.06.2019 | 07.01.2020 | direktør |
Kim Hersland | 28.02.2018 | 26.11.2020 | direktør |
Werner Ernst Spiegler | 17.11.2016 | 12.06.2019 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Hersland | 12.06.2019 | 26.11.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Christian Frederik Harboe Wissum | 12.06.2019 | 26.11.2020 | formand |
Werner Schmidt | 12.06.2019 | 07.02.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Werner Ernst Spiegler | 17.11.2016 | 12.06.2019 | formand |