Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Sadja Mansali Topsøe-Jensen | 01.08.2018 | 06.10.2018 | adm. dir |
Enes Cekic | 01.03.2018 | 01.07.2018 | adm. dir |
Niels Sadja Mansali Topsøe-Jensen | 01.08.2017 | 01.03.2018 | adm. dir |
Enes Cekic | 25.07.2017 | 01.08.2017 | adm. dir |
Niels Sadja Mansali Topsøe-Jensen | 10.11.2016 | 24.07.2017 | direktør |