Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Riccardo Mascheroni | 03.11.2023 | 11.06.2024 | adm. dir |
Daniel Marcus Coole | 03.11.2023 | 22.04.2024 | direktør |
Riccardo Mascheroni | 31.10.2022 | 16.08.2023 | adm. dir |
Daniel Marcus Coole | 09.01.2020 | 16.08.2023 | direktør |
Jörgen Ingemar Levin | 09.01.2020 | 31.10.2022 | adm. dir |
Bruno, Georges, Marie, Marcel Tromeur | 18.10.2016 | 09.01.2020 | direktør |
Sharon Jee Mei Lee | 18.10.2016 | 25.09.2017 | direktør |