Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Casper Zwicki Mayntzhusen | 17.11.2016 | 07.03.2018 | adm. dir |
Alexander Swartz Augustesen | 26.02.2016 | 17.11.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Baumgarten | 17.11.2016 | 07.03.2018 | formand |
Patrick Lyon Veirum | 02.09.2016 | 19.09.2016 | formand |
Anders Casper Zwicki Mayntzhusen | 26.02.2016 | 02.09.2016 | formand |
Jan Baumgarten | 26.02.2016 | 02.09.2016 | næstformand |