Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nicklas Skovby Rasmussen | 12.07.2019 | 21.04.2020 | direktør |
Morten Rinder Stengaard | 01.09.2016 | 21.04.2020 | adm. dir |
Jacob Christian Bratting Pedersen | 05.05.2016 | 01.09.2016 | adm. dir |
Lars Lund-Nielsen | 02.03.2016 | 04.05.2016 | direktør |