Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Jan Mundberg | 01.04.2020 | 05.05.2022 | adm. dir |
Mette Marie Thers Lund Mundberg | 10.06.2016 | 01.04.2020 | adm. dir |
Kim Jan Mundberg | 10.06.2016 | 26.12.2017 | direktør |
Kim Jan Mundberg | 30.01.2016 | 09.06.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Jan Mundberg | 01.04.2020 | 05.05.2022 | formand |
Mette Marie Thers Lund Mundberg | 26.12.2017 | 01.04.2020 | formand |
Kim Jan Mundberg | 10.06.2016 | 26.12.2017 | formand |
Mette Marie Thers Lund Mundberg | 10.06.2016 | 25.12.2017 | næstformand |