Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 01.08.1975 | 29.01.2001 | direktion |
Erik Madsen | 01.08.1975 | 21.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 01.08.1975 | 29.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Rasmussen | 01.08.1975 | 29.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Agnes Helene Olsen | 01.08.1975 | 29.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Erik Madsen | 01.08.1975 | 21.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Kathe Hein Petersen | 01.08.1975 | 21.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Marie Nielsen | 01.08.1975 | 21.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 01.08.1975 | 21.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Rasmussen | 01.08.1975 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |