Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgitte Eriksen | 29.02.2016 | 23.08.2022 | adm. dir |
Jesper Thulesen | 17.11.2015 | 29.02.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Eriksen | 29.02.2016 | 01.06.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jesper Thulesen | 17.11.2015 | 01.06.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kim Valentino Bendix Novaa | 17.11.2015 | 01.06.2016 | formand |