Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Holstborg | 01.01.2009 | 16.04.2014 | adm. dir |
Steen Kisselhegn | 01.01.2009 | 30.04.2009 | direktion |
Erling Godske Zeest Larsen | 06.12.1920 | 31.07.1991 | direktion |
Rud Lauridsen | 06.12.1920 | 19.04.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Burkhard Middendorf | 07.12.2012 | 16.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Peter Matthias Angenendt | 07.12.2012 | 16.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Christoph Lüdecke | 07.12.2012 | 16.04.2014 | formand |
Lars Krause-Kjær | 09.11.2009 | 07.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Søren Otto Sloth | 14.10.2006 | 07.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Hans Hougaard Bang-Hansen | 14.10.2006 | 09.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bent Gunnar Nielsen | 06.12.1920 | 07.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Niels Gottrup Mikkelsen | 06.12.1920 | 07.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Skak Olufsen | 06.12.1920 | 07.12.2012 | formand |
Bendt Asbjørn Sloth | 06.12.1920 | 14.10.2006 | bestyrelse |
Niels Peter Arildsen | 06.12.1920 | 14.10.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ravn Haldrup | 06.12.1920 | 27.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Dahl | 06.12.1920 | 09.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Jakobsen | 06.12.1920 | 14.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Høgh Jensen | 06.12.1920 | 14.11.1989 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ejnar Nielsen | 06.12.1920 | 01.11.1987 | bestyrelse |