Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Philip Heller-Christensen | 20.06.2018 | 08.02.2022 | adm. dir |
Bruno de Andrade Nielsen | 10.02.2015 | 20.06.2018 | direktion |
Valeria Zenaide Heller-Christensen | 10.02.2015 | 01.01.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Philip Heller-Christensen | 10.02.2015 | 20.06.2018 | bestyrelse |
Bruno de Andrade Nielsen | 10.02.2015 | 20.06.2018 | bestyrelse |