Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Rosenkilde | 03.12.1997 | 24.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kent Nielsen | 03.12.1997 | 24.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Kallesø | 26.03.1997 | 24.11.1998 | formand |
Gert Johannes Mauritzen | 12.12.1992 | 03.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Eskil Freddy Andersen | 12.12.1992 | 03.12.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jacobi | 12.12.1992 | 03.12.1997 | suppleant |
Jon Søberg | 12.12.1992 | 26.03.1997 | formand |