Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Wagn Frejdahl Christensen | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | direktion |
Ole Troelsø | 15.04.1984 | 02.08.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Wagn Frejdahl Christensen | 15.04.1984 | 15.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Holm Lauridsen | 15.04.1984 | 15.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ivan Meyer | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Michael Gylling Nielsen | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Janus Hillgaard | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Emil Wanscher | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Holm Lauridsen | 15.04.1984 | 10.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Paul Roderick Smith | 15.04.1984 | 23.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Vammen Jepsen | 15.04.1984 | 23.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Goran Olenborg | 15.04.1984 | 23.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Lars Kabel | 15.04.1984 | 23.06.1987 | bestyrelse |
Hans Møller Kristensen | 15.04.1984 | 23.06.1987 | bestyrelse |