Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Holstener Larsen | 31.12.2020 | 22.08.2022 | adm. dir |
Mads Clausen | 01.01.2015 | 31.12.2020 | direktør |
Thomas Holstener Larsen | 01.01.2015 | 30.12.2020 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Holstener Larsen | 31.12.2020 | 22.08.2022 | formand |
Mads Clausen | 01.01.2015 | 31.12.2020 | næstformand |
Thomas Holstener Larsen | 01.01.2015 | 30.12.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |