Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Thoft-Nielsen | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | direktion |
Bent Hilbert Jensen | 18.08.1961 | 08.03.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Dragsgaard Dall | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Pedersen | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ryon Thorkild Gregers Gregersen | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Poul Sindberg | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Poul Christian Davidsen | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bent Hilbert Jensen | 18.08.1961 | 26.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Peter Christian Nouvel Buch | 18.08.1961 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Niels Ove Hessellund Arkil | 18.08.1961 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Tage Sørensen | 18.08.1961 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Anker Jacobsen | 18.08.1961 | 14.04.1992 | bestyrelse |