Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mads Aagaard | 24.11.2014 | 01.06.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ayad Ali-Hassan Khadij | 24.11.2014 | 29.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Michael Have | 24.11.2014 | 29.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Johan Aagaard Banach | 24.11.2014 | 27.01.2015 | formand |