Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Mortensen | 26.10.2016 | 29.08.2017 | adm. dir |
Flemming Mortensen | 22.12.2014 | 17.08.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Mortensen | 07.11.2014 | 17.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Mikki Bohnhof | 07.11.2014 | 17.08.2016 | formand |
Helena Henriete Coco Lemonidis | 07.11.2014 | 01.01.2015 | bestyrelse |