Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Beck | 20.11.2018 | 19.08.2019 | adm. dir |
Oliver Stendal Dehli | 01.03.2018 | 20.11.2018 | adm. dir |
Saba Ahmed | 01.07.2016 | 01.03.2018 | adm. dir |
Jahanzeeb Ahmed | 15.12.2015 | 01.07.2016 | adm. dir |
Saba Ahmed | 01.09.2014 | 15.12.2015 | adm. dir |