Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Villena Toft | 27.03.2015 | 27.03.2015 | direktør |
Gertrud Marie Larsen | 26.03.2015 | 27.03.2015 | adm. dir |
Christian Villena Toft | 17.02.2015 | 26.03.2015 | direktion |
Dan Mark Hansen | 09.01.2015 | 17.02.2015 | adm. dir |
Ginalyn Villena Toft | 01.12.2014 | 09.01.2015 | adm. dir |
Niels-Erik Schousbo Brøchner | 14.08.2014 | 01.12.2014 | adm. dir |