Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Brock | 02.07.2015 | 18.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Flemming Thrane | 25.07.2014 | 30.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Brock | 02.07.2015 | 18.08.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Dorte Brock Johansen | 25.07.2014 | 02.07.2015 | bestyrelse |
Michael Brock | 25.07.2014 | 01.07.2015 | formand |
Flemming Thrane | 25.07.2014 | 30.11.2014 | bestyrelse |