Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Erik Olsen | 26.11.2015 | 05.07.2016 | direktør |
Bent Erik Olsen | 01.04.2014 | 15.10.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Forman-Ankjær | 26.11.2015 | 05.07.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Andreas Claudius Frandsen | 26.11.2015 | 05.07.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Hans Christian Stigaard | 26.11.2015 | 05.07.2016 | formand |
Christian Forman-Ankjær | 01.04.2014 | 15.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Andreas Claudius Frandsen | 01.04.2014 | 15.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Stigaard | 01.04.2014 | 15.10.2015 | formand |