Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leon Brinkmann Hess | 05.02.2020 | 05.10.2021 | direktør |
Bjarne Hansen | 27.07.2015 | 05.02.2020 | direktør |
Leon Brinkmann Hess | 06.03.2014 | 15.09.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leon Brinkmann Hess | 05.02.2020 | 05.10.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Susan Hess | 05.02.2020 | 05.10.2021 | formand |
Frederik Brinkmann Hess | 12.12.2016 | 05.10.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bjarne Hansen | 12.12.2016 | 05.02.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Leon Brinkmann Hess | 12.12.2016 | 04.02.2020 | formand |
Pia Foldager | 15.09.2015 | 12.12.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Mette Therkildsen | 15.09.2015 | 12.12.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Juhl Hansen | 15.09.2015 | 12.12.2016 | formand |
Kristian Frost | 27.07.2015 | 15.09.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bjarne Hansen | 06.03.2014 | 15.09.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Lars Hendrichsen | 06.03.2014 | 15.09.2015 | formand |
Leon Brinkmann Hess | 06.03.2014 | 27.07.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |