Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulrik Nymann Fausing | 09.09.2013 | 28.06.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulrik Nymann Fausing | 23.05.2014 | 28.06.2016 | bestyrelse |
Sigurd Ravnborg Jakobsen | 23.05.2014 | 01.01.2016 | bestyrelse |
Michael Kjær Salmansen | 23.05.2014 | 30.06.2015 | formand |