Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aleksander Herforth Rendtslev | 18.05.2016 | 01.06.2021 | adm. dir |
Daniel Vestergaard | 18.05.2016 | 28.07.2020 | direktør |
Jacob Harboe Kristensen | 29.07.2013 | 28.07.2020 | direktion |
Aleksander Herforth Rendtslev | 29.07.2013 | 17.05.2016 | direktion |
Mads Bach Andersen | 29.07.2013 | 06.10.2014 | direktion |
Nicolai Elkjær Hansen | 29.07.2013 | 06.10.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aleksander Herforth Rendtslev | 18.05.2016 | 28.07.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Daniel Vestergaard | 18.05.2016 | 28.07.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jacob Harboe Kristensen | 18.05.2016 | 28.07.2020 | formand |