Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Monika Elisabeth Hostrup | 11.05.2009 | 31.12.2013 | direktion |
Svend Aage Lorenz | 29.11.1971 | 11.05.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Aage Lorenz | 29.11.1971 | 11.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Lorenz | 29.11.1971 | 11.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Monika Elisabeth Hostrup | 29.11.1971 | 11.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Holm Lorenz | 29.11.1971 | 25.11.1997 | bestyrelse |