Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mads Gade Carvalho Henrichsen | 27.11.2018 | 27.12.2021 | adm. dir |
Jesper Kjærsgaard-Nielsen | 09.02.2015 | 27.11.2018 | adm. dir |
Rene Kjærsgaard-Nielsen | 29.11.2012 | 09.02.2015 | direktør |
Bjarne Thordahl Henrichsen | 29.11.2012 | 14.03.2013 | direktør |