Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Floarea Lupu | 06.08.2013 | 28.10.2014 | direktion |
Abdul Karim Ahmad Karim | 08.05.2013 | 06.08.2013 | direktion |
Azeddine Bachatene | 11.03.2013 | 08.05.2013 | adm. dir |
Erling Mazen El-Labban | 17.09.2012 | 11.02.2013 | direktion |
Walid Khaled Abd Elmajid | 10.08.2012 | 17.09.2012 | direktion |