Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Peter Henriksen | 31.07.2012 | 30.05.2022 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Chrom Jacobsen | 08.04.2014 | 16.03.2015 | formand |
Lars Peter Henriksen | 31.07.2012 | 30.05.2022 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Allan Rasmussen | 31.07.2012 | 08.04.2014 | formand |