Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Carl Brandt | 12.06.2014 | 25.09.2014 | adm. dir |
Aaron Grayson Dorseth | 14.04.2013 | 12.06.2014 | direktion |
Anna Kongeskov Randow | 16.10.2012 | 14.04.2013 | adm. dir |
Aaron Grayson Dorseth | 12.10.2012 | 16.10.2012 | adm. dir |
Anna Kongeskov Randow | 31.07.2012 | 12.10.2012 | adm. dir |
Aaron Grayson Dorseth | 18.07.2012 | 31.07.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anna Kongeskov Randow | 16.10.2012 | 14.04.2013 | formand |
Aaron Grayson Dorseth | 31.07.2012 | 16.10.2012 | formand |
Anna Kongeskov Randow | 31.07.2012 | 12.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Rabøl Puigventos | 31.07.2012 | 12.10.2012 | bestyrelse |