Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ulletved Rasmussen | 16.10.2012 | 15.09.2015 | direktion |
Sune Olsen | 21.06.2012 | 16.10.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ulletved Rasmussen | 16.10.2012 | 15.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Sune Olsen | 16.10.2012 | 15.09.2015 | formand |
Ole Christian Olsen | 01.08.2012 | 15.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Soldal | 21.06.2012 | 01.08.2012 | formand |