Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Birger Dissing | 13.06.2012 | 10.03.2017 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Kruse | 09.01.2017 | 03.04.2017 | formand |
Anja Fronciak | 23.06.2015 | 01.12.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bo Kruse | 13.06.2012 | 08.01.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bo Kruse | 13.06.2012 | 13.12.2016 | formand |
Lars Henning Brammer | 13.06.2012 | 12.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Birger Dissing | 13.06.2012 | 23.06.2015 | bestyrelse |