Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Mahmoud Amin El Shahhat | 21.09.2015 | 09.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Ahmed Mahmoud Amin El Shahhat | 06.08.2012 | 05.09.2012 | direktion |
Sulaman Shah | 08.06.2012 | 21.09.2015 | adm. dir |
Nagah Saddek Ibrahim Shams Eldin | 29.04.2012 | 30.06.2012 | direktion |