Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mattias Pedro Ahlberg | 25.02.2013 | 12.12.2014 | direktion |
Christopher Henric Torsten Clewehielm | 25.02.2013 | 12.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Christina Trauboth | 25.02.2013 | 24.09.2013 | direktion |
Christopher Henric Torsten Clewehielm | 10.04.2012 | 25.02.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christina Trauboth | 08.05.2012 | 25.02.2013 | suppleant |
Mattias Pedro Ahlberg | 10.04.2012 | 25.02.2013 | suppleant |