Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Bech Povelsen | 10.04.2001 | 31.01.2011 | direktion |
Kim Damgaard Mortensen | 10.04.2001 | 01.02.2007 | direktion |
Hans Herluf Lorentzen | 15.12.1976 | 10.04.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Bech Povelsen | 01.02.2007 | 31.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Stella Jacobsson | 01.02.2007 | 31.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kim Jacobsson | 01.02.2007 | 31.01.2011 | formand |