Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Jespersen | 06.12.2022 | 28.02.2023 | adm. dir |
Albert Kirk Iversen | 24.10.2022 | 06.12.2022 | adm. dir |
Allan Jespersen | 24.06.2022 | 24.10.2022 | adm. dir |
Albert Kirk Iversen | 08.06.2022 | 24.06.2022 | adm. dir |
Allan Jespersen | 15.06.2012 | 08.06.2022 | adm. dir |
Thomas Pedersen | 15.03.2012 | 29.04.2015 | direktør |