Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Smith | 23.07.2013 | 01.10.2015 | adm. dir |
Henrik Vestergaard | 02.04.2013 | 27.06.2013 | adm. dir |
Jesper Padborg | 08.10.2012 | 02.04.2013 | adm. dir |
Michael Frørup | 10.02.2012 | 08.10.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Philip Maury | 23.07.2013 | 01.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Smith | 23.07.2013 | 01.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Solveig Annie Leifsdottir | 16.02.2013 | 08.07.2013 | bestyrelse |
Michael Frørup | 08.10.2012 | 01.10.2015 | formand |
Henrik Vestergaard | 10.02.2012 | 08.07.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Asmussen | 10.02.2012 | 16.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Padborg | 10.02.2012 | 08.10.2012 | formand |