Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Susanne Bandholm | 16.04.2013 | 23.09.2013 | direktion |
Peter Johansen | 02.02.2012 | 03.11.2015 | direktion |
Peter Sønderlyng | 02.02.2012 | 16.04.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Maan Tokkesdal | 07.08.2015 | 03.11.2015 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Lars Buhl | 07.08.2015 | 03.11.2015 | formand |
David Packness Meyer | 23.09.2013 | 07.08.2015 | formand |
Lars Buhl | 23.09.2013 | 06.08.2015 | bestyrelse |
Peter Johansen | 02.02.2012 | 03.11.2015 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Maan Tokkesdal | 02.02.2012 | 23.09.2013 | formand |