Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Buhrkall | 18.11.2014 | 19.04.2017 | direktion |
Per Bergkvist | 23.05.2013 | 18.11.2014 | direktion |
Bent Acher Johansen | 22.12.2011 | 23.05.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Olsen | 23.05.2013 | 19.04.2017 | bestyrelse |
Bent Acher Johansen | 23.05.2013 | 19.04.2017 | formand |
Erik Slot | 22.12.2011 | 19.04.2017 | bestyrelse |
Stefan Istvan Svéd | 22.12.2011 | 23.05.2013 | formand |